Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 50 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7791 Week
» 28233 Month
» 365079 Year
» 1586644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4653
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Star 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 24/10/1925
Castle 4009 SHOOTING STAR 13/07/1929
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 31/08/1932
Castle 4037 QUEEN PHILIPPA 28/10/1935
Castle 4087 CARDIGAN CASTLE 26/01/1939
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 01/06/1945
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 08/03/1947
Castle 5008 RAGLAN CASTLE 11/07/1949
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 10/04/1951