Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2528 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15934 Week
» 68950 Month
» 188477 Year
» 3215330 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #4656
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HA |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Star |
4032 |
QUEEN ALEXANDRA |
15/04/1926 |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
14/12/1932 |
Castle |
4086 |
BUILTH CASTLE |
21/02/1935 |
Castle |
4037 |
THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS |
02/06/1938 |
Castle |
5007 |
ROUGEMONT CASTLE |
23/05/1945 |
|