Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1176 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 2407 Week
» 14112 Month
» 345601 Year
» 422188 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6616
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE 28/05/1934
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 20/12/1937
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 29/07/1941
Castle 5092 TRESCO ABBEY 26/04/1944
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 28/05/1946
Castle 5024 CAREW CASTLE 20/01/1948
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 27/07/1950
Castle 5007 ROUGEMONT CASTLE 12/03/1952
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 17/06/1954
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 12/06/1956
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 17/12/1958
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 14/04/1961