Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1154 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8608 Week
» 11190 Month
» 275823 Year
» 1497388 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6679
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 03/12/1940
Castle 5097 SARUM CASTLE 31/01/1945
Castle 5070 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 02/08/1946
Castle 5023 BRECON CASTLE 22/06/1948
Castle 5063 EARL BALDWIN 14/03/1950
Castle 4087 CARDIGAN CASTLE 06/11/1951
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 11/08/1953
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 03/01/1956
Castle 5004 LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE 01/08/1958
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 09/12/1960