Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 327 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8666 Week
» 5774 Month
» 112720 Year
» 1334285 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6648
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5059 POWIS CASTLE 08/06/1937
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 24/02/1945
Castle 5038 MORLAIS CASTLE 20/12/1946
Castle 5054 EARL OF DUCIE 04/03/1949
Castle 4087 CARDIGAN CASTLE 30/04/1953
Castle 5070 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 16/06/1955
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 30/04/1958
Castle 5004 LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE 13/07/1960