Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 388 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 388 Week
» 7193 Month
» 114139 Year
» 1335704 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6629
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 11/07/1935
Castle 5085 EVESHAM ABBEY 03/05/1945
Castle 5021 WHITTINGTON CASTLE 08/09/1945
Castle 5013 ABERGAVENNY CASTLE 21/07/1948
Castle 5008 RAGLAN CASTLE 09/03/1951
Castle 5047 EARL OF DARTMOUTH 23/02/1953
Castle 4087 CARDIGAN CASTLE 04/03/1955
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 07/11/1956
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 06/11/1958
Castle 5062 EARL OF SHAFTESBURY 12/01/1961