Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1107 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8561 Week
» 11143 Month
» 275776 Year
» 1497341 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6676
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5090 NEATH ABBEY 01/05/1939
Castle 5047 EARL OF DARTMOUTH 11/11/1946
Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE 01/02/1949
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 13/02/1951
Castle 4088 DARTMOUTH CASTLE 27/03/1953
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 01/02/1955
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 16/10/1956
Castle 5075 WELLINGTON 14/10/1958
Castle 5037 MONMOUTH CASTLE 03/05/1962