Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2688 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16094 Week
» 69110 Month
» 188637 Year
» 3215490 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6667
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5037 |
MONMOUTH CASTLE |
20/08/1946 |
Castle |
4099 |
KILGERRAN CASTLE |
20/05/1948 |
Castle |
5091 |
CLEEVE ABBEY |
16/05/1950 |
Castle |
5004 |
LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE |
03/07/1952 |
Castle |
4088 |
DARTMOUTH CASTLE |
25/10/1954 |
Castle |
7020 |
GLOUCESTER CASTLE |
18/12/1954 |
Castle |
5040 |
STOKESAY CASTLE |
19/06/1958 |
|