Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6687
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5064 BISHOP'S CASTLE 19/08/1942
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 07/09/1946
Castle 5038 MORLAIS CASTLE 09/11/1948
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 07/09/1950
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 09/02/1953
Castle 5035 COITY CASTLE 10/12/1956
Castle 5017 THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT 28TH 61ST 12/01/1959
Castle 5047 EARL OF DARTMOUTH 16/12/1960