Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 327 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 327 Week
» 7132 Month
» 114078 Year
» 1335643 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7613
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HC
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7021 HAVERFORDWEST CASTLE 06/1949
Castle 7025 SUDELEY CASTLE 30/03/1951
Castle 5099 COMPTON CASTLE 18/05/1953
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 18/02/1958
Castle 5074 HAMPDEN 21/01/1960
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 18/01/1962