Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 339 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5976 Week
» 19080 Month
» 19080 Year
» 1240645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6699
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HC
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7007 OGMORE CASTLE 01/07/1946
Castle 7006 LYDFORD CASTLE 25/08/1948
Castle 5098 CLIFFORD CASTLE 11/03/1949
Castle 7017 G. J. CHURCHWARD 21/12/1950
Castle 7008 SWANSEA CASTLE 10/11/1954
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 21/08/1957
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 27/11/1959
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 09/02/1962