Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4640
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 27/07/1927
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 08/04/1930
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 11/03/1932
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 09/07/1935
Castle 111 VISCOUNT CHURCHILL 17/09/1941
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 09/12/1946
Castle 5034 CORFE CASTLE 04/01/1949
Castle 5068 BEVERSTON CASTLE 26/10/1951
Castle 5007 ROUGEMONT CASTLE 01/12/1953