Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 338 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 338 Week
» 7143 Month
» 114089 Year
» 1335654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4631
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 28/05/1927
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 18/06/1930
Castle 100A1 LLOYD'S 14/08/1937
Castle 5014 GOODRICH CASTLE 30/03/1943
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 02/08/1947
Castle 5033 BROUGHTON CASTLE 04/05/1949