Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 303 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 303 Week
» 7108 Month
» 114054 Year
» 1335619 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6613
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5026 CRICCIETH CASTLE 30/04/1934
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 07/01/1941
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 12/07/1945
Castle 5094 TRETOWER CASTLE 25/09/1947
Castle 5095 BARBURY CASTLE 22/03/1950
Castle 5013 ABERGAVENNY CASTLE 27/11/1951
Castle 5015 KINGSWEAR CASTLE 18/06/1953
Castle 5085 EVESHAM ABBEY 11/10/1955
Castle 5041 TIVERTON CASTLE 26/09/1957
Castle 5044 EARL OF DUNRAVEN 26/09/1957