Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 472 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1811 Week
» 31309 Month
» 368155 Year
» 1589720 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4630
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 28/08/1926
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 14/08/1929
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 11/08/1931
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 25/05/1934
Castle 5026 CRICCIETH CASTLE 10/02/1944
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 21/12/1945
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 20/06/1947