Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 267 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 267 Week
» 7072 Month
» 114018 Year
» 1335583 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6660
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5073 CRANBROOK CASTLE 13/07/1938
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 26/02/1944
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 24/05/1947
Castle 5035 COITY CASTLE 23/12/1949
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 21/09/1951
Castle 5034 CORFE CASTLE 29/04/1954
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 20/05/1955
Castle 5038 MORLAIS CASTLE 05/08/1959
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 17/11/1961