Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 372 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 372 Week
» 7177 Month
» 114123 Year
» 1335688 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6657
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5070 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 03/07/1938
Castle 5054 EARL OF DUCIE 15/03/1943
Castle 5068 BEVERSTON CASTLE 16/04/1948
Castle 5037 MONMOUTH CASTLE 30/01/1950
Castle 5020 TREMATON CASTLE 20/05/1952
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 30/12/1955
Castle 4098 KIDWELLY CASTLE 15/03/1957
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 18/09/1959