Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15658 Week
» 68674 Month
» 188201 Year
» 3215054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6664
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5077 |
EASTNOR CASTLE |
15/08/1938 |
Castle |
5015 |
KINGSWEAR CASTLE |
25/09/1943 |
Castle |
5073 |
BLENHEIM |
09/01/1948 |
Castle |
5010 |
RESTORMEL CASTLE |
08/05/1950 |
Castle |
5016 |
MONTGOMERY CASTLE |
10/06/1952 |
Castle |
5009 |
SHREWSBURY CASTLE |
07/11/1957 |
Castle |
4098 |
KIDWELLY CASTLE |
27/01/1961 |
|