Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 414 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 414 Week
» 7219 Month
» 114165 Year
» 1335730 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6689
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 05/08/1943
Castle 5096 BRIDGWATER CASTLE 02/05/1947
Castle 5020 TREMATON CASTLE 08/04/1949
Castle 4000 NORTH STAR 15/11/1951
Castle 5092 TRESCO ABBEY 25/11/1953
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 16/12/1955
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 14/12/1959
Castle 5076 GLADIATOR 17/05/1962