Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1831 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19634 Week
» 72650 Month
» 192177 Year
» 3219030 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #4647
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HA |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
29/07/1931 |
Castle |
5009 |
SHREWSBURY CASTLE |
17/10/1933 |
Castle |
5005 |
MANORBIER CASTLE |
24/12/1937 |
Castle |
5036 |
LYONSHALL CASTLE |
16/10/1947 |
Castle |
5078 |
BEAUFORT |
30/11/1949 |
Castle |
5066 |
WARDOUR CASTLE |
07/05/1952 |
Castle |
5059 |
EARL ST ALDWYN |
01/03/1956 |
|