Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 1208 Yesterday
» 1322 Week
» 25283 Month
» 188337 Year
» 264924 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6615
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 26/05/1934
Castle 5024 CAREW CASTLE 21/03/1938
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 20/02/1946
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 03/09/1947
Castle 5023 BRECON CASTLE 14/02/1950
Castle 5073 BLENHEIM 16/01/1952
Castle 4037 THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS 01/03/1954
Castle 5021 WHITTINGTON CASTLE 17/12/1958
Castle 5013 ABERGAVENNY CASTLE 21/10/1960