Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18095 Week
» 71111 Month
» 190638 Year
» 3217491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7638
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HC |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5097 |
SARUM CASTLE |
28/06/1950 |
Castle |
7008 |
SWANSEA CASTLE |
06/10/1952 |
Castle |
7032 |
DENBIGH CASTLE |
18/04/1955 |
Castle |
7008 |
SWANSEA CASTLE |
04/04/1957 |
Castle |
5081 |
LOCKHEED HUDSON |
02/11/1959 |
Castle |
5002 |
LUDLOW CASTLE |
06/11/1961 |
|