Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4290 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17696 Week
» 70712 Month
» 190239 Year
» 3217092 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6619
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5032 |
USK CASTLE |
25/05/1934 |
Castle |
5060 |
EARL OF BERKELEY |
26/01/1939 |
Castle |
5063 |
EARL BALDWIN |
03/01/1942 |
Castle |
5090 |
NEATH ABBEY |
23/03/1948 |
Castle |
5035 |
COITY CASTLE |
03/09/1951 |
Castle |
5012 |
BERRY POMEROY CASTLE |
13/10/1953 |
Castle |
5006 |
TREGENNA CASTLE |
09/11/1956 |
Castle |
5059 |
EARL ST ALDWYN |
31/10/1958 |
|