Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1939 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19742 Week
» 72758 Month
» 192285 Year
» 3219138 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6670
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5066 |
WARDOUR CASTLE |
06/07/1937 |
Castle |
5068 |
BEVERSTON CASTLE |
15/01/1944 |
Castle |
5090 |
NEATH ABBEY |
13/04/1946 |
Castle |
5072 |
HURRICANE |
03/08/1948 |
Castle |
5085 |
EVESHAM ABBEY |
08/08/1950 |
Castle |
5032 |
USK CASTLE |
27/05/1952 |
Castle |
5017 |
ST DONAT'S CASTLE |
05/01/1954 |
Castle |
5027 |
FARLEIGH CASTLE |
03/06/1957 |
Castle |
5008 |
RAGLAN CASTLE |
12/06/1959 |
|