Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1143 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1143 Week
» 3725 Month
» 268358 Year
» 1489923 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6605
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5018 ST MAWES CASTLE 28/07/1932
Castle 5014 GOODRICH CASTLE 11/12/1935
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 02/12/1938
Castle 5018 ST MAWES CASTLE 12/10/1942
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 12/12/1946
Castle 5092 TRESCO ABBEY 02/02/1949
Castle 5022 WIGMORE CASTLE 11/10/1951
Castle 5083 BATH ABBEY 01/07/1953
Castle 5092 TRESCO ABBEY 23/08/1955
Castle 5010 RESTORMEL CASTLE 17/06/1958