Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 206 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 6918 Week
» 20022 Month
» 20022 Year
» 1241587 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6666
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5079 LYDFORD CASTLE 19/05/1939
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 07/11/1945
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 10/10/1947
Castle 5053 EARL CAIRNS 16/08/1949
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 08/06/1951
Castle 5013 ABERGAVENNY CASTLE 27/05/1953
Castle 5016 MONTGOMERY CASTLE 24/05/1957