Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15304 Week
» 68320 Month
» 187847 Year
» 3214700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7644
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HC |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5096 |
BRIDGWATER CASTLE |
29/11/1950 |
Castle |
7026 |
TENBY CASTLE |
10/11/1952 |
Castle |
5074 |
HAMPDEN |
02/07/1954 |
Castle |
7016 |
CHESTER CASTLE |
20/09/1956 |
Castle |
5082 |
SWORDFISH |
03/02/1959 |
Castle |
5023 |
BRECON CASTLE |
08/02/1961 |
|