Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1195 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14601 Week
» 67617 Month
» 187144 Year
» 3213997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6696
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HC |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7004 |
EASTNOR CASTLE |
19/06/1946 |
Castle |
7000 |
VISCOUNT PORTAL |
17/11/1948 |
Castle |
7005 |
LAMPHEY CASTLE |
26/07/1951 |
Castle |
5075 |
WELLINGTON |
06/10/1953 |
Castle |
5082 |
SWORDFISH |
12/10/1955 |
Castle |
7010 |
AVONDALE CASTLE |
03/07/1959 |
Castle |
5025 |
CHIRK CASTLE |
20/04/1961 |
|