Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1004 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14410 Week
» 67426 Month
» 186953 Year
» 3213806 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7615
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HC |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7023 |
PENRICE CASTLE |
24/06/1949 |
Castle |
7024 |
POWIS CASTLE |
01/03/1951 |
Castle |
7007 |
GREAT WESTERN |
16/01/1953 |
Castle |
5075 |
WELLINGTON |
16/06/1955 |
Castle |
5032 |
USK CASTLE |
05/07/1957 |
Castle |
7027 |
THORNBURY CASTLE |
25/04/1960 |
|