Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7642
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HC |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7020 |
GLOUCESTER CASTLE |
10/12/1952 |
Castle |
7007 |
GREAT WESTERN |
13/01/1955 |
Castle |
5034 |
CORFE CASTLE |
12/02/1957 |
Castle |
7009 |
ATHELNEY CASTLE |
27/06/1961 |
|