Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 284 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 284 Week
» 7089 Month
» 114035 Year
» 1335600 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7635
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HC
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5081 LOCKHEED HUDSON 23/05/1950
Castle 7015 CARN BREA CASTLE 13/02/1952
Castle 7026 TENBY CASTLE 18/02/1954
Castle 7030 CRANBROOK CASTLE 31/03/1954
Castle 7015 CARN BREA CASTLE 13/09/1955
Castle 7028 CADBURY CASTLE 29/10/1959
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 16/02/1962