Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 339 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5976 Week
» 19080 Month
» 19080 Year
» 1240645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7621
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HC
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7027 THORNBURY CASTLE 02/09/1949
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 11/09/1953
Castle 5083 BATH ABBEY 22/05/1957
Castle 5065 NEWPORT CASTLE 08/06/1959
Castle 5099 COMPTON CASTLE 26/06/1961