Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 340 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5977 Week
» 19081 Month
» 19081 Year
» 1240646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #7600
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HC
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7008 SWANSEA CASTLE 05/1948
Castle 7021 HAVERFORDWEST CASTLE 24/01/1951
Castle 5098 CLIFFORD CASTLE 08/12/1952
Castle 5077 FAIREY BATTLE 08/03/1956
Castle 7010 AVONDALE CASTLE 19/09/1957
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 05/01/1960