Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 675 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14081 Week
» 67097 Month
» 186624 Year
» 3213477 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2561
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
50 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q6 |
1250 |
|
09/01/1934 |
Q6 |
1249 |
|
30/10/1936 |
Q6 |
2295 |
|
15/09/1939 |
Q6 |
2232 |
|
24/12/1942 |
Q6 |
3409 |
|
16/03/1946 |
Q6 |
3374 |
|
21/05/1948 |
|