Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 189 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 1262 Week
» 20588 Month
» 247349 Year
» 758451 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #988/HL109
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 50
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B15 821   22/11/1935
B15 815   19/11/1941
Q6 2238   07/12/1944
Q6 3350   04/01/1947
Q6 3378   09/06/1950