Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1152 Today
» 1080 Yesterday
» 6840 Week
» 23552 Month
» 23552 Year
» 534654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2570
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 50
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q6 2290   23/02/1934
Q6 2255   25/05/1940
Q6 1280   03/07/1942
Q6 2256   24/06/1944
Q6 3442   29/03/1947
Q6 63457   10/09/1949