Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 314 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5919 Week
» 17466 Month
» 417148 Year
» 493735 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3002/24229
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 50A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q6 2244   16/02/1939
Q6 1294   06/12/1941
Q6 2215   25/03/1944
Q6 63455   12/05/1950
Q6 63447   16/09/1953
Q6 63344   19/06/1959