Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1150 Today
» 1080 Yesterday
» 6838 Week
» 23550 Month
» 23550 Year
» 534652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2639
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 50
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B15 787   09/03/1935
Q6 1361   20/03/1944
Q6 3447   19/04/1947
Q6 63367   19/01/1950