Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1152 Today
» 1080 Yesterday
» 6840 Week
» 23552 Month
» 23552 Year
» 534654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2818
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 50
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q6 2278   25/09/1936
Q6 2249   12/03/1940
Q6 2226   12/03/1942
Q6 2290   08/07/1944
Q6 3428   24/05/1947