Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 872 Today
» 930 Yesterday
» 5068 Week
» 21719 Month
» 215563 Year
» 726665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3141/24163
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 50A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q6 2290   17/05/1940
Q6 2282   18/08/1944
Q6 3396   27/02/1948
Q6 63459   07/10/1953
Q6 63398   08/04/1959
Q6 63387   04/04/1963