Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 745 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 745 Week
» 12523 Month
» 301915 Year
» 813017 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4030/24182
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 50A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q6 63447   12/12/1949
Q6 63426   05/12/1953
Q6 63340   25/06/1956
Q6 63378   29/10/1960