Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 547 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 547 Week
» 30045 Month
» 366891 Year
» 1588456 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2692
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 922   11/09/1935
B16 2379   26/11/1940
Q7 626   08/07/1944
Q7 3460   19/12/1947