Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 100 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5208 Week
» 34706 Month
» 371552 Year
» 1593117 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24022
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61425   26/05/1951
B16 61419   25/09/1954
B16 61424   05/06/1957
Q7 63460   28/01/1961