Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 102 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5210 Week
» 34708 Month
» 371554 Year
» 1593119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1610
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 624   19/03/1924
Q7 625   20/01/1930
B16 930   11/08/1933
Q7 624   03/09/1936
Q7 903   04/08/1940
B16 842   18/06/1943
B16 927   09/05/1946