Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1274 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7663 Week
» 28105 Month
» 364951 Year
» 1586516 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1513
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2379   30/06/1923
Q7 631   14/08/1933
Q7 630   28/10/1936
Q7 904   27/06/1939
B16 936   21/08/1942