Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1299 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7688 Week
» 28130 Month
» 364976 Year
» 1586541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2783
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 905   18/01/1936
B16 2366   17/02/1940
B16 1372   13/03/1942
B16 2367   24/08/1944
B16 1461   07/06/1947
B16 61430   03/09/1948