Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 490 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1829 Week
» 31327 Month
» 368173 Year
» 1589738 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1588
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 1382   13/12/1923
B16 2365   29/09/1930
B16 936   20/01/1934
Q7 628   02/12/1936
Q7 905   14/12/1939