Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 456 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1795 Week
» 31293 Month
» 368139 Year
» 1589704 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2558
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 1378   11/01/1934
B16 921   14/05/1937
B16 936   17/02/1940
Q7 905   01/10/1942
B16 1405   30/11/1946
B16 61436   15/09/1949