Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1007 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7397 Week
» 36895 Month
» 373741 Year
» 1595306 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2265
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 936   30/10/1930
B16 908   26/01/1934
B16 1381   24/12/1936
B16 932   09/11/1939
B16 2363   13/02/1943
Q7 3464   31/08/1946