Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1269 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7658 Week
» 28100 Month
» 364946 Year
» 1586511 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1667
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 849   14/02/1927
Q7 624   04/05/1933
B16 908   11/11/1936
B16 923   02/05/1939
B16 842   07/05/1941
B16 2378   14/08/1943
Q7 631   01/07/1944